Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Eduardo Scheinig

Auxiliary Bishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Ita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1959 Born
9 Dec 198324.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
18 May 201757.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
18 May 201757.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ita
15 Jul 201758.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ita

MicroData Summary for Jorge Eduardo Scheinig
Bishop Jorge Eduardo Scheinig (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mercedes-Luján

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarapachay, Diocese of San Isidro
Ordained PriestSan Isidro Labrador, Cathedral, San Isidro, Diocese of San Isidro
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Luján, Basilica, Luján, Archdiocese of Mercedes-Luján

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Mercedes-Luján.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 May 2017
  • c1: CB, 18 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 12 Jun 2017
  • c6: CB, 15 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast