Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Cremin

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney, Australia

Titular Bishop of Cunga Féichin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1930 Born
12 Jun 195525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
25 Oct 197343.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
25 Oct 197343.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cunga Féichin
19 Jan 197443.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cunga Féichin
22 Feb 200575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for David Cremin
Bishop David Cremin (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallydoorty, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Sydney.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast