Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anthony Ferrario

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1926Born
19 May 195125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
8 Nov 197751.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
8 Nov 197751.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cusae
13 Jan 197851.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cusae
13 May 198256.1AppointedBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
25 Jun 198256.3InstalledBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
12 Oct 199367.6RetiredBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
12 Dec 200377.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anthony Ferrario
Bishop Joseph Anthony Ferrario (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Honolulu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScranton, PA

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018