Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hélio Adelar Rubert

Archbishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1945 BornSegredo
18 Dec 197126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
4 Aug 199954.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
4 Aug 199954.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
3 Oct 199954.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
24 Mar 200458.9AppointedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Apr 201165.9AppointedArchbishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
11 Jun 201469.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Mar 201569.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hélio Adelar Rubert:
Archbishop Hélio Adelar Rubert (born ) Archbishop of Santa Maria

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Maria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,635
  • ab: CB, 11 Jun 2014
  • r: CB, 17 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Dec 2014