Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joăo Cardinal Bráz de Aviz

Prefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1947 BornMafra
26 Nov 197225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
6 Apr 199447.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
6 Apr 199447.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
31 May 199447.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
12 Aug 199851.3AppointedBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
17 Jul 200255.2AppointedArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
28 Jan 200456.8AppointedArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
27 Mar 200456.9InstalledArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
4 Jan 201163.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
18 Feb 201264.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201264.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina
20 May 201265.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina
28 Feb 201365.8CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
16 Mar 201365.9ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

MicroData Summary for Joăo Bráz de Aviz:
Joăo Cardinal Bráz de Aviz (born ) Prefect of Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,323
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1e01: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 11 May 2012
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014