Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geraldo Lyrio Rocha

Archbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1942 BornFundão
15 Aug 196725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
14 Mar 198442.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
14 Mar 198442.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
31 May 198442.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
23 Apr 199048.1AppointedBishop of Colatina, Espirito Santo, Brazil
16 Jan 200259.8AppointedArchbishop of Vitória da Conquista, Baia, Brazil
11 Apr 200765.1AppointedArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Jun 200765.3InstalledArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Lyrio Rocha:
Archbishop Geraldo Lyrio Rocha (born ) Archbishop of Mariana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mariana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2007
  • i: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 May 2014