Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Geraldo Oliveira do Valle, C.S.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1929 BornLeme
10 Jan 195424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
10 May 198252.4AppointedBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Jul 198252.6Ordained BishopBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil
31 Aug 198858.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Sep 198959.8SucceededBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Apr 200676.4RetiredBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Geraldo Oliveira do Valle:
Bishop José Geraldo Oliveira do Valle C.S.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Guaxupé

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guaxupé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013