Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odilon Guimarães Moreira

Bishop Emeritus of Itabira-Fabriciano, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1939 BornPresidente Bernardes
23 Jan 196930.0Ordained PriestPriest of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Aug 199960.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
4 Aug 199960.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
24 Oct 199960.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
22 Jan 200364.0AppointedBishop of Itabira-Fabriciano, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Feb 201374.1ResignedBishop of Itabira-Fabriciano, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Odilon Guimarães Moreira:
Bishop Odilon Guimarães Moreira (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Itabira-Fabriciano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itabira-Fabriciano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,641
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Apr 2014