Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Bravo Salazar

Bishop of Acarigua-Araure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1967 BornEl Pilar
28 Nov 199225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela
10 Aug 201547.7AppointedBishop of Acarigua-Araure, Venezuela
24 Oct 201547.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acarigua-Araure, Venezuela
31 Oct 201547.9InstalledBishop of Acarigua-Araure, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Bravo Salazar:
Bishop Juan Carlos Bravo Salazar (born ) Bishop of Acarigua-Araure

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Acarigua-Araure.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Aug 2015
  • ob: CB, 21 Aug 2015
  • c34/i: CB, 15 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015