Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Modesto González Pérez, S.D.B.

Bishop of Guasdualito, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1959 Born
3 Sep 198324.1Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Jul 198627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
3 Dec 201556.4AppointedBishop of Guasdualito, Venezuela
6 Feb 201656.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guasdualito, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Pablo Modesto González Pérez
Bishop Pablo Modesto González Pérez S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Guasdualito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Antonio de los Altos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guasdualito.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast