Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Dao

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kayes, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1936Born
26 Jun 196529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ségou, Mali
12 Sep 197842.2AppointedBishop of Kayes, Mali
27 Jan 197942.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kayes, Mali
11 Jun 201175.0RetiredBishop of Kayes, Mali
23 Oct 201175.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kayes, Mali

MicroData Summary for Joseph Dao
Bishop Joseph Dao (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kayes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBobo-Dioulasso

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2011
  • d: CB, 24 Oct 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018