Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Sambou

Bishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1947 Born
29 Dec 197528.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 200355.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
29 Jun 200355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal

MicroData Summary for Ernest Sambou
Bishop Ernest Sambou (born ) Bishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCadjinol

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Louis du Sénégal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,418

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast