Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Oliver Barres

Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1960 Born
21 Oct 198929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
27 May 200948.6AppointedBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
30 Jul 200948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Dec 201656.2AppointedBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
31 Jan 201756.3InstalledBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Oliver Barres
Bishop John Oliver Barres (born ) Bishop of Rockville Centre

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort Chester, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockville Centre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,254
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2016
  • i: CB, 9 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Sep 2017