Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Sahagún de la Parra

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1922 Born
26 May 194624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
22 May 196139.3AppointedBishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México
8 Sep 196139.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México
11 Sep 198563.6AppointedBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
3 May 199371.3ResignedBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Sahagún de la Parra
Bishop José de Jesús Sahagún de la Parra (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotija

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast