Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ismael Rueda Sierra

Archbishop of Bucaramanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1950 BornSuaita
22 Aug 198131.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
198837.6IncardinatedPriest of Girardot, Colombia
20 Dec 200050.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia
20 Dec 200050.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Buruni
17 Feb 200150.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buruni
27 Jun 200353.1AppointedBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
13 Feb 200958.8AppointedArchbishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
2 May 200959.0InstalledArchbishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ismael Rueda Sierra:
Archbishop Ismael Rueda Sierra (born ) Archbishop of Bucaramanga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bucaramanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013