Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orlando Olave Villanoba

Bishop of Tumaco, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1969 Born
5 Dec 199829.8Ordained PriestPriest of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
18 Mar 201748.1AppointedBishop of Tumaco, Colombia
6 May 201748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tumaco, Colombia
20 May 201748.3InstalledBishop of Tumaco, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Orlando Olave Villanoba
Bishop Orlando Olave Villanoba (born ) Bishop of Tumaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarrancabermeja, Diocese of Barrancabermeja
Ordained BishopBarrancabermeja, Diocese of Barrancabermeja

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tumaco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 19 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 29 Apr 2017
  • c34: CB, 6 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 May 2017