Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kigoma

Dioecesis Kigomaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Mlola, ALCP/OSS, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1953
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tabora
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 42,000 (16,222 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 71, Kigoma, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (028)280.3115/6
  • Fax: 280.2043

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Tanganika
27 September 1880ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Tanganika (erected)
10 May 1946Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Tanganika Vicariate Apostolic of Karema (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kigoma
10 May 1946Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore}
Vicariate Apostolic of Tanganika
Vicariate Apostolic of Kigoma
Diocese of Kigoma
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kigoma Diocese of Kigoma

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kigoma
195014,702355,0004.1%241433414117ap1951
Diocese of Kigoma
196976,801496,64915.5%242441,745526716ap1971
1980100,135474,00021.1%825333,034285414ap1981
1990165,002850,30019.4%1521364,583237015ap1991
1999342,6331,035,28433.1%3919585,907269116ap2000
2000398,9751,238,35632.2%3917567,124256417ap2001
2001419,5761,247,17833.6%3913528,068229617ap2002
2002427,4041,247,17834.3%4613597,2442210517ap2003
2003429,3041,259,69434.1%4618646,707259818ap2004
2004409,9001,680,00924.4%4620666,2102913218ap2005
2006439,5081,824,00024.1%479567,8482014419ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Aug 2014