Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Liberatus Sangu

Bishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1963 Born
9 Jul 199431.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sumbawanga, Tanzania
2 Feb 201551.9AppointedBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania
12 Apr 201552.1Ordained BishopBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Liberatus Sangu
Bishop Liberatus Sangu (born ) Bishop of Shinyanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMwazye

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shinyanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2015
  • bp: CB, 2 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 27 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 12 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast