Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Melzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1661Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 1661AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
20 Mar 1661Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
6 Apr 1687³DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Melzi:
Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Melzi (died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 123, Number 749
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013