Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Odoardo Cardinal Vecchiarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613BornRieti
29 Apr 165845.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
5 Apr 166047.3Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 166047.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
5 May 166047.3AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
6 Jun 166047.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
31 Jul 166754.6DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Odoardo Vecchiarelli:
Cardinal Odoardo Vecchiarelli (died ) Bishop of Rieti

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
  • a cardinal for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Apr 1658
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 293
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 746

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013