Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Martinotti (Martinozzi)

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Sep 1642Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 1661AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
20 Mar 1661Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
1677¹DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Martinotti (Martinozzi)
Bishop Federico Martinotti (Martinozzi) (died 1677) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenis

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 123, Number 749
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast