Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand von Fürstenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn

Bishop of Münster

Vicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1626BornBilstein
14 Dec 165933.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
20 Apr 166134.5SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
30 May 166134.6ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
6 Jun 166134.6Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Jul 166740.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Münster, Germany
20 Apr 166841.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Münster, Germany
19 Sep 167851.9SucceededBishop of Münster, Germany
2 Sep 168053.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover), Germany
26 Jun 168356.7DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand von Fürstenberg:
Bishop Ferdinand von Fürstenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,435
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013