Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Pisanelli

Deceased

Bishop of Sora, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1619Born
22 Jun 165435.4AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
24 Jun 165435.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
30 Sep 167556.7AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
13 Jul 168061.5DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Pisanelli
Bishop Marco Antonio Pisanelli (born , died ) Bishop of Sora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoneti

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 360
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast