Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Roberti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605²BornRome, Italy
2 Dec 165853.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
8 Dec 165853.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
15 Feb 166661.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
7 Mar 166762.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Jul 166762.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
14 Feb 167368.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Roberti:
Carlo Cardinal Roberti (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
  • a cardinal for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Feb 1666
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 31 Mar 2015