Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Thiel

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1826BornLokau
30 Sep 184923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
15 Dec 188559.2SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
12 Feb 188659.4ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
9 May 188659.6Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
17 Jul 190881.8DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Andreas Thiel:
Bishop Andreas Thiel (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013