Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustinus Bludau

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1862Born
13 Mar 188725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
26 Nov 190846.7SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
12 Apr 190947.0ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
20 Jun 190947.2Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
9 Feb 193067.9DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Augustinus Bludau
Bishop Augustinus Bludau (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGŘttstadt
Ordained BishopCathedral, Frauenberg

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1909, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,065
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast