Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Romano Gómez

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Vagal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1959 Born
26 May 198526.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Mar 200041.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Mar 200041.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagal
9 Apr 200041.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagal
17 Nov 201455.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Miguel Romano Gómez
Bishop Miguel Romano Gómez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Paso, TX, USA

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,745
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Feb 2018