Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Guerrero Córdova, S.D.B.

Prelate Emeritus of Mixes, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1941 Born
20 Jul 196826.8ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Dec 196827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
3 Mar 200765.4AppointedPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México
28 Apr 200765.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México
13 Jun 201876.7RetiredPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Héctor Guerrero Córdova
Bishop Héctor Guerrero Córdova S.D.B. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Mixes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopAuditorium, Ayutla

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Mixes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,411
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Aug 2018

Quantcast