Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Pedro (Antonio) Rodríguez Rozas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pinar del Rio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1911BornSan Cristóbal de la Habana
31 Mar 193523.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
16 Jan 196048.6AppointedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
27 Mar 196048.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
3 Apr 196048.8InstalledBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
4 Dec 197867.5ResignedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
28 Mar 198270.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Pinar del Rio, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Manuel Pedro (Antonio) Rodríguez Rozas:
Bishop Manuel Pedro (Antonio) Rodríguez Rozas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pinar del Rio

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013