Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Acácio Rodrigues Alves

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1925Born
12 Mar 194923.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 196237.2AppointedBishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
16 Sep 196237.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
12 Jul 200075.2RetiredBishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
24 Aug 201085.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Acácio Rodrigues Alves
Bishop Acácio Rodrigues Alves (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palmares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaranhuns

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 145
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017