Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Doth de Oliveira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1938Born
13 Dec 196426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil
23 Dec 198951.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
13 May 199052.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
18 Dec 199153.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil
26 Jul 200062.4SucceededBishop of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil
7 Jan 200970.8ResignedBishop of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil
26 Nov 201779.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Doth de Oliveira
Bishop José Doth de Oliveira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iguatu

EventPlace
Birth PlacePedra Branca
Ordained BishopSte Anne, Cathedral, Iguatu, Diocese of Iguatu, Ceara
Death PlacePedra Branca

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,067
  • d: CB, 26 Nov 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast