Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Genival Saraiva de França

Bishop Emeritus of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil

Apostolic Administrator of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1938 Born
1 Jan 196526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
12 Jul 200062.2AppointedBishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
23 Sep 200062.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
19 Mar 201475.9RetiredBishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
6 Jul 201678.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Paraíba, Brazil
20 May 201779.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Paraíba, Brazil
26 Oct 201880.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Genival Saraiva de França
Bishop Genival Saraiva de França (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Palmares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcantil
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esportes “O Meninão”, Palmares, Diocese of Palmares, Pernambuco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palmares.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,844
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2014
  • ab: CB, 6 Jul 2016
  • aadm: CB, 1 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast