Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Anthony Cronin

Archbishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1927 BornBoston
20 Dec 195225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
10 Jun 196840.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
10 Jun 196840.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Egnatia
12 Sep 196840.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egnatia
30 Oct 197043.0AppointedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
16 Dec 197043.1InstalledBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
10 Dec 199164.1AppointedArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
28 Jan 199264.2InstalledArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
20 Oct 200375.9RetiredArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Anthony Cronin:
Archbishop Daniel Anthony Cronin (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hartford

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hartford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013