Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Denis Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1860Born
16 Jun 188625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
9 Dec 191049.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
9 Dec 191049.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cestrus
26 Jan 191150.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cestrus
16 Jan 191958.0AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
20 May 191958.3InstalledBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
26 Mar 192665.2DiedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Denis Kelly
Bishop Edward Denis Kelly (born , died ) Bishop of Grand Rapids

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHartford, MI

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018