Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Correia Cardoso Monteiro

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1844BornRégua
22 Sep 186622.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Apr 186723.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 190460.8SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
10 Mar 190561.1ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
28 May 190561.4Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
20 Jun 191066.4DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Correia Cardoso Monteiro:
Bishop José Correia Cardoso Monteiro (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 56
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013