Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ceslaus Hendricus Jacobus Reijnen (Heynen), O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1836Born
10 Aug 186326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Aug 188649.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
24 Aug 188649.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
12 Dec 188650.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
10 May 188750.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Ceslaus Hendricus Jacobus Reijnen (Heynen) (VIAF: 281067032)
Bishop Ceslaus Hendricus Jacobus Reijnen (Heynen) O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBois le Duc, Vicariate Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
Ordained BishopPietermaals, Curaçao, Vicariate Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017