Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Danehy, M.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Pando, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Bita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1914Born
17 Sep 193925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
15 Jun 194834.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pando, Bolivia
27 Nov 195238.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bita
22 Apr 195338.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bita
9 Oct 195945.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Pando, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Danehy
Bishop Thomas Joseph Danehy M.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Pando

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFort Wayne, IN, USA

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast