Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Francis Noll

Deceased

Bishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1875Born
4 Jun 189823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
12 May 192550.2AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
30 Jun 192550.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
2 Sep 195378.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
31 Jul 195681.5DiedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis Noll
Archbishop John Francis Noll (born , died ) Bishop of Fort Wayne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFort Wayne

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast