Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mary Marling, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jefferson City, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1904BornCentralia, WV
21 Feb 192924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
7 Jun 194742.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
7 Jun 194742.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasus
6 Aug 194742.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasus
24 Aug 195651.9AppointedBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
2 Jul 196964.8ResignedBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
2 Jul 196964.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesina
16 Jan 197671.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Lesina
2 Oct 197975.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mary Marling:
Bishop Joseph Mary Marling C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jefferson City

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015