Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Michael Jarrell

Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1940 BornOpelousas
3 Jun 196727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
29 Dec 199252.6AppointedBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
4 Mar 199352.8Ordained BishopBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
8 Nov 200262.4AppointedBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
18 Dec 200262.5InstalledBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
17 Feb 201675.7RetiredBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Michael Jarrell
Bishop Charles Michael Jarrell (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lafayette.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,005
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 17 Feb 2016