Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serge Patrick Poitras

Bishop of Timmins, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1949 Born
27 May 197324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
10 Nov 201263.4AppointedBishop of Timmins, Ontario, Canada
27 Dec 201263.5Ordained BishopBishop of Timmins, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Serge Patrick Poitras
Bishop Serge Patrick Poitras (born ) Bishop of Timmins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJonquière

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Timmins.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2012
  • ob/c23: CB, 12 Nov 2012
  • c2+: CB, 27 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,618

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast