Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Pedro Pozzi, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1925Born
25 Nov 195126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Jul 199368.0AppointedBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina
25 Sep 199368.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina
16 Oct 199368.2InstalledBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina
19 Mar 200377.6RetiredBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina
26 Nov 201792.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Pedro Pozzi
Bishop José Pedro Pozzi S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alto Valle del Río Negro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVimercate
Ordained BishopSanta Rosa, Diocese of Santa Rosa
Death PlaceGeneral Roca, Diocese of Alto Valle del Río Negro

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,335
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast