Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Arturo Meinvielle, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Justo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1931BornBuenos Aires
23 Nov 195827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Nov 198049.0AppointedBishop of Concepción, Argentina
13 Dec 198049.1Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Argentina
28 Dec 198049.2InstalledBishop of Concepción, Argentina
23 Apr 199159.5AppointedBishop of San Justo, Argentina
31 May 199159.6InstalledBishop of San Justo, Argentina
2 Mar 200371.3DiedBishop of San Justo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Arturo Meinvielle:
Bishop Jorge Arturo Meinvielle S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of San Justo

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014