Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Duque Jaramillo, O.F.M.

Bishop of Garzón


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1950 BornArmenia
1 Feb 197524.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Nov 197525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Nov 200353.5AppointedBishop of Armenia, Colombia
31 Jan 200453.7Ordained BishopBishop of Armenia, Colombia
11 Jun 201262.1AppointedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
29 Sep 201262.4InstalledBishop of Garzón, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fabio Duque Jaramillo:
Bishop Fabio Duque Jaramillo O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Garzón

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Garzón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,521
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2012
  • i: CB, 30 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013