Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Thorman

Deceased

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1871Born
24 Oct 188312.2Converted
27 Sep 189625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 192453.3AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
27 Jan 192553.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
7 Oct 193665.1DiedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Thorman
Bishop Joseph Thorman (born , died ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGateshead, County Durham

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 4
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018