Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Giusti

Bishop of Livorno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1955 Born
5 Nov 198328.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pisa, Italy
18 Oct 200752.3AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
10 Nov 200752.3Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
2 Dec 200752.4InstalledBishop of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Giusti (VIAF: 3546025)
Bishop Simone Giusti (born ) Bishop of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCascine di Buti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Livorno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+/i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,561

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast