Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Savio, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1944Born
25 Mar 197227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Apr 199349.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Livorno, Italy
14 Apr 199349.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Garriana
30 May 199349.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garriana
9 Dec 200056.6AppointedBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
18 Feb 200156.8InstalledBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
31 Mar 200459.9DiedBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Savio
Bishop Vincenzo Savio S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno-Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsio Sotto

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,157
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast