Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Gonzaga Bergonzini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1936BornSão João da Boa Vista
29 Jun 195923.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 199155.5AppointedBishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Feb 199255.7Ordained BishopBishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Nov 201175.5RetiredBishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
13 Jun 201276.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Gonzaga Bergonzini:
Bishop Luiz Gonzaga Bergonzini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guarulhos

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,656
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2011
  • d: CB, 13 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014