Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacyr Francisco Braido, C.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Santos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1940 BornRoca Sales
22 Feb 197029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
22 Feb 199554.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Apr 199555.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 May 199555.1InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Jul 200060.2SucceededBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
6 May 201575.0RetiredBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jacyr Francisco Braido:
Bishop Jacyr Francisco Braido C.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,546
  • r: Bollettino, 6 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 6 May 2015