Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Antônio Peruzzo

Archbishop of Curitiba, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1960 BornCascavel
22 Dec 198525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
24 Aug 200545.3AppointedBishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil
23 Nov 200545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil
7 Jan 201554.7AppointedArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
19 Mar 201554.9InstalledArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Antônio Peruzzo:
Archbishop José Antônio Peruzzo (born ) Archbishop of Curitiba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Curitiba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,009
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 7 May 2015